Rocky Creek Peanut Farm LLC v. Perdue
Plaintiff: Rocky Creek Peanut Farm LLC
Defendant: George Ervin Perdue, III and Sonny
Case Number: 1:2019cv00364
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker and Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case. (am, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & Complaint signed by illegible for George Ervin Perdue, III served on 5/30/2019. (am, ) Modified on 6/12/2019 to correct the docket text to remove the erroneous answer deadline, see doc #5 for correct deadline(am, ).
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Rocky Creek Peanut Farm LLC re #3 Notice of Deficiency . (Reese, Charles) Modified on 6/5/2019 to add linkage to #3 Notice of Deficiency (am, ).
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Emily Sase on 5/31/2018 for William Barr. (djy, )
May 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines:George Ervin Perdue, III Answer due by 7/27/2019. (NO PDF attached to this entry). (am, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & Complaint signed by Yasmine Smith for US Attorney's Office served on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/27/2019 for George Ervin Perdue, III. (am, ) Modified on 6/12/2019 to correct the docket text to correct the answer deadline(am, ).
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to George Ervin Perdue, III, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General and mailed CMRRR w/copy of #1 Complaint. (am, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Rocky Creek Peanut Farm LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Format)(am, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Rocky Creek Peanut Farm LLC. (am, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George Ervin Perdue, III, filed by Rocky Creek Peanut Farm LLC. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 4602053653.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(am, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/29/2019 with signed Civil Cover Sheet) (am, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocky Creek Peanut Farm LLC v. Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Ervin Perdue, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Creek Peanut Farm LLC
Represented By: Charles Neville Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?