Hobbs et al v. 3M Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michelle Stewmon, Sammy Ward, Christopher Millard, Ricky Medley, Justin Bowley, Jason Palfreeman, Tracy S. Hobbs, Delane Holloway, Nicky Medley, Lloyd Ankrum, Kevin Axton, Joshua Gilbert, Jeramy Smith, Rufus Miles, William Willingham, Richard Bowden, Logan Mitchell, Boyce Howard and Jef Edward Fisher
Defendant: 3M Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00422
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Andrew L Brasher
2 Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Received email from ND/FL regarding receipt of e-transfer case; ND/FL case number assigned as 3:19-cv-01937. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
July 2, 2019 Case transferred to the Northern District of Florida; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Received certified copy of transfer order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of Florida.(alm, )
June 26, 2019 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Kelly Webster for 3M Company, Inc. served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (alm, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (alm, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lloyd Ankrum, Kevin Axton, Richard Bowden, Justin Bowley, Jef Edward Fisher, Joshua Gilbert, Tracy S. Hobbs, Delane Holloway, Boyce Howard, Nicky Medley, Ricky Medley, Rufus Miles, Christopher Millard, Logan Mitchell, Jason Palfreeman, Jeramy Smith, Michelle Stewmon, Sammy Ward, William Willingham. (alm, )
June 17, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lloyd Ankrum, Kevin Axton, Richard Bowden, Justin Bowley, Jef Edward Fisher, Joshua Gilbert, Tracy S. Hobbs, Delane Holloway, Boyce Howard, Nicky Medley, Ricky Medley, Rufus Miles, Christopher Millard, Logan Mitchell, Jason Palfreeman, Jeramy Smith, Michelle Stewmon, Sammy Ward, William Willingham. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (alm, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602053935), filed by Jef Edward Fisher, Sammy Ward, Tracy S. Hobbs, Nicky Medley, Logan Mitchell, Christopher Millard, Michelle Stewmon, Jeramy Smith, Delane Holloway, Justin Bowley, Lloyd Ankrum, Kevin Axton, William Willingham, Ricky Medley, Joshua Gilbert, Richard Bowden, Rufus Miles, Jason Palfreeman, Boyce Howard. (Attachments: #1 Filing Fee Receipt)(alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobbs et al v. 3M Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Stewmon
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammy Ward
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Millard
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Medley
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Bowley
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Palfreeman
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy S. Hobbs
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delane Holloway
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicky Medley
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Ankrum
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Axton
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Gilbert
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeramy Smith
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufus Miles
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Willingham
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bowden
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Mitchell
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boyce Howard
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jef Edward Fisher
Represented By: Jon Paul Sawyer
Represented By: Joseph Holland Aughtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?