Tippmann Engineering, LLC v. Dothan Warehouse Investors, LLC

Plaintiff: Tippmann Engineering, LLC
Defendant: Dothan Warehouse Investors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00477
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 7/25/2019. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re #4 Motion: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602054312. (kr, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re #3 Motion: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602054311. (kr, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Elizabeth M.C. Scheibel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tippmann Engineering, LLC. (Lightfoot, Warren) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2019: #1 Correct Certificate of Good Standing) (kr, ). Modified on 7/24/2019 to clarify text (kr, ).
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Daniel M. Lechleiter to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tippmann Engineering, LLC. (Lightfoot, Warren) Modified on 7/24/2019 to clarify text and correct the attorney's name (kr, ).
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tippmann Engineering, LLC. (kh, )
July 3, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tippmann Engineering, LLC. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dothan Warehouse Investors, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054118.), filed by Tippmann Engineering, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Errata D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tippmann Engineering, LLC v. Dothan Warehouse Investors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tippmann Engineering, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth M.C. Scheibel
Represented By: Daniel M. Lechleiter
Represented By: Warren Bricken Lightfoot, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dothan Warehouse Investors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?