Vanlandingham v. Helms et al
Plaintiff: Noel Vanlandingham
Defendant: The City of Abbeville, Alabama, Billy Helms, Dorothy Baker, Terry Allums, Brendt Murphy, Rena' Cosby and Harold Robinson, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00500
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #12 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline; Plaintiff's response to #3 Motion to Dismiss due by 9/24/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/23/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry)(cnw, ) Modified on 8/23/2019 to clarify the docket text (cnw, ).
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Deadline by Noel Vanlandingham. (Fowler, Dustin) Modified on 8/22/2019 to clarify docket text (cnw, ).
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as referral Judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cnw, )
July 22, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to US Magistrate Judge Walker: #3 MOTION TO DISMISS. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: it is ORDERED that plf's #9 motion is GRANTED; Plf shall file his response to defs' #3 motion to dismiss on or before 9/3/2019; Defs may file a reply within seven days of the date of the response. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/19/2019. (cnw, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline by Noel Vanlandingham. (Fowler, Dustin) Modified on 7/19/2019 to clarify docket text and to correct the event type (cnw, ).
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Noel Vanlandingham. (Fowler, Dustin)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is ORDERED that plf shall file a response to defs' #3 motion on or before 8/1/2019; counsel are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 7/29/2019, as further set out in order; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor reassignment into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/18/2019. (cnw, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (ALL PARTIES) Terry Allums, Dorothy Baker, Rena' Cosby, Billy Helms, Brendt Murphy, Harold Robinson, Jr, The City of Abbeville, Alabama, Noel Vanlandingham. (cnw, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit by Terry Allums, Dorothy Baker, Rena' Cosby, Billy Helms, Brendt Murphy, Harold Robinson, Jr, The City of Abbeville, Alabama re #4 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(cnw, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Terry Allums, Dorothy Baker, Rena' Cosby, Billy Helms, Brendt Murphy, Harold Robinson, Jr, The City of Abbeville, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Transcript)(cnw, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS by Terry Allums, Dorothy Baker, Rena' Cosby, Billy Helms, Brendt Murphy, Harold Robinson, Jr, The City of Abbeville, Alabama. (cnw, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Terry Allums, Dorothy Baker, Rena' Cosby, Billy Helms, Brendt Murphy, Harold Robinson, Jr, The City of Abbeville, Alabama. (cnw, )
July 15, 2019 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Terry Allums, Dorothy Baker, Rena' Cosby, Billy Helms, Brendt Murphy, Harold Robinson, Jr, The City of Abbeville, Alabama re #1 Notice of Removal. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )
July 15, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Noel Vanlandingham. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )
July 15, 2019 COMPLAINT against Terry Allums, Dorothy Baker, Rena' Cosby, Billy Helms, Brendt Murphy, Harold Robinson, Jr, The City of Abbeville, Alabama, filed by Noel Vanlandingham. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf)(cnw, ) Modified on 7/17/2019 to correct the filing date (cnw, ).
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Terry Allums, Dorothy Baker, Rena' Cosby, Billy Helms, Brendt Murphy, Harold Robinson, Jr, The City of Abbeville, Alabama from Circuit Court of Henry County, case number 37-cv-2019-900050. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054249) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 receipt) (cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanlandingham v. Helms et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Abbeville, Alabama
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Helms
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Baker
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Allums
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendt Murphy
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rena' Cosby
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Vanlandingham
Represented By: Stephen Talmadge Etheredge, Sr.
Represented By: Dustin Judd Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?