Brown v. Beckman et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Brown
Defendant: Houston County Jail, Sgt. Peterson and Randall Beckman
Case Number: 1:2019cv00603
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON MOTION granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer; further ORDERING that defs be GRANTED an extension from 10/7/2019 to and including 11/18/2019 to file their special report and answer.Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/7/2019. (cnw, )
October 7, 2019 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Randall Beckman, Sgt. Peterson. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
October 7, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #10 MOTION - Attorney Ashley Hawkins Freeman for Randall Beckman, Sgt. Peterson added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Randall Beckman. (Hill, Charles)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sgt. Peterson. (Hill, Charles)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer by Randall Beckman, Sgt. Peterson. (Hill, Charles)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON MOTION: it is ORDERED that: 1) This #8 motion for amendment be and is hereby GRANTED; 2) This case shall henceforth proceed only against Randall Beckman and Sgt. Peterson; 3) The Houston County Jail shall be terminated as a defendant; 4) The #5 Recommendation that the Houston County Jail be dismissed as a defendant be and is hereby WITHDRAWN as moot; 5) The claims presented by the plaintiff relate to actions which occurred in April of 2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/6/2019. (cnw, )
September 5, 2019 AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT Re: #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint, filed by Charles Edward Brown. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #8 for pdf)(cnw, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Amendment #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint by Charles Edward Brown. (cnw, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT & #4 Order signed by Kim Adkins for Randall Beckman served on 9/3/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (cnw, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #4 Order signed by Jaritz Goode for Sgt. Peterson served on 8/27/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (kr, )
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #9 ORDER) RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) The plf's claims against the Houston County Jail be dismissed with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); 2) The Houston County Jail be dismissed as a def in this cause of action; 3) This case, with respect to the plf's claims against defs Beckman and Peterson, be referred back to the undersigned for appropriate proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 9/9/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/26/2019. (cnw, ) Modified on 9/6/2019 (cnw, ).
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT on or before 10/7/2019; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to individual defendants Randall Beckman and Sgt. Peterson. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/26/2019. (cnw, )
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Henry County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/26/2019. (furn: cashier) (cnw, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Charles Edward Brown. (es, )
August 21, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Charles Edward Brown.(No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ). (es, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Randall Beckman, Houston County Jail, Sgt. Peterson, filed by Charles Edward Brown.(es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Beckman et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Peterson
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Beckman
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Represented By: Ashley Hawkins Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?