Neal v. GMRI, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Neal
Defendant: Jamal L. Rowell, GMRI, Inc. and GMRI, Inc. doing business as Cheddars Scratch Kitchen
Case Number: 1:2019cv00647
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff, as to why the #9 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 11/7/2019; Defendants may file a reply on or before 11/14/2019; counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete and send to the Clerk of the Court the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 11/14/2019, as further set out in order; DO NOT FILE THE FORM ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/24/2019. (kr, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by GMRI, Inc., Jamal L. Rowell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Melinda Anderson)(Swain, Jennifer)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's #7 Unopposed Motion for Ten-Day Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by GMRI, Inc., it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/8/2019. (kr, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Ten-Day Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by GMRI, Inc.. (Swain, Jennifer) Modified on 10/8/2019 to clarify text (kr, ).
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Julie B. for GMRI, Inc. served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (kh, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint and summons signed by Jamal Rowell for Jamal L. Rowell served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (dmn, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GMRI, Inc., Jamal L. Rowell; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (kr, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Teresa Neal. (kr, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Teresa Neal. (kr, )
September 6, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Teresa Neal. (No pdf attached to this entry - See docket entry #1 ) (kr, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GMRI, Inc., Jamal L. Rowell ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054821.), filed by Teresa Neal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(kr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. GMRI, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Neal
Represented By: Temple DeAnna Trueblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamal L. Rowell
Represented By: Jennifer Fox Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMRI, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Fox Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMRI, Inc. doing business as Cheddars Scratch Kitchen
Represented By: Jennifer Fox Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?