Williams v. Golden Peanut Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Randy Williams
Defendant: Allen Twiggs, EJ West, Josh Knight and Golden Peanut Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00667
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Schach, Patrick)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 10/3/2019. (kr, )
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: it is ORDERED that Defendants' #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED; DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to terminate Defendants Knight, Twiggs, and West as defendants in the above-styled case. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 10/3/2019. (kr, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge e-signed by counsel for Golden Peanut Company, LLC, Josh Knight, Allen Twiggs, EJ West. (kr, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge signed by counsel for Randy Williams. (kr, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Randy Williams. (Toles, Vicky)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Randy Williams. (Toles, Vicky)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Golden Peanut Company, LLC, Josh Knight, Allen Twiggs, EJ West. (Bradford, Stacey)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Plaintiffs TO SHOW CAUSE as to why the #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Josh Knight, Allen Twiggs, EJ West should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 9/30/2019. Defendants may reply on or before 10/7/2019. Any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 9/30/2019 as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/16/2019. (dmn, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES - Golden Peanut Company, LLC, Josh Knight, Allen Twiggs, EJ West, Randy Williams. (kr, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Josh Knight, Allen Twiggs, EJ West. (kr, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Golden Peanut Company, LLC.(kr, )
September 11, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Randy Williams. (No pdf attached to this entry - See docket entry #1 for pdf) (kr, )
September 11, 2019 COMPLAINT against Golden Peanut Company, LLC, Josh Knight, Allen Twiggs, EJ West, filed by Randy Williams. (No pdf attached to this entry - See docket entry #1 for pdf) (kr, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Golden Peanut Company, LLC, Josh Knight, Allen Twiggs, EJ West from Circuit Court of Henry County, Alabama, case number 37-cv-2019-900074.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054896) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Receipt)(kr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Golden Peanut Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Twiggs
Represented By: Patrick Drake Schach
Represented By: Stacey Thurman Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EJ West
Represented By: Patrick Drake Schach
Represented By: Stacey Thurman Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Knight
Represented By: Patrick Drake Schach
Represented By: Stacey Thurman Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Peanut Company, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Drake Schach
Represented By: Stacey Thurman Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Williams
Represented By: Vicky Underwood Toles
Represented By: Norman Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?