Rice v. Saul (CONSENT)
Plaintiff: Christopher Lavon Rice
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00683
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge e-signed by counsel for Andrew Saul. (kr, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge e-signed by counsel for Christopher Lavon Rice. (kr, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, #3 Order with no signature for Andrew Saul served on 10/28/2019. (kr, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #3 Order signed by Emily Sase for U.S. Attorney General served on 10/21/2019. (kr, ) Modified on 11/6/2019 to add date served (kr, ).
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, #3 Order signed by (Illegible) Adams for Office of Regional Chief Counsel served on 10/21/2019. (kr, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #3 Order, #4 Summons signed by Jordan Johnson for U. S. Attorney's Office, served on 10/17/2019, answer for Andrew Saul due 1/15/2020. (cnw, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney, Social Security Office of Regional Counsel, and U.S. Attorney General; mailed CMRRR with copies of #1 Complaint and #3 Order. (kr, )
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDER TO ANSWER Social Security Complaint within 90 days after the date of service of the complaint; plaintiff to file brief in support within 40 days of filing of the answer; defendant's reply brief and administrative record due within 30 days of brief filing; Copies mailed to counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/10/2019. (kr, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Lavon Rice. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(bes, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Christopher Lavon Rice. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Saul (CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lavon Rice
Represented By: Walter Allen Blakeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?