Owens v. Hill et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Zachary G. Owens
Defendant: Matthew G. Stevens, James Hill, Keith Shehee, Kieth Shehee and Jimmy Hill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00699
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #5 Order and #6 Final Judgment mailed to Zachary G. Owens returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, No Longer Here." (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order entered on this date adopting the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the Court that this case is DISMISSED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a Final Judgment pursuant to FRCP 58. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 10/21/2019. (dmn, )
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that: The #4 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED as further set out in the order. This case is summarily dismissed. A separate Final Judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 10/21/2019. (dmn, )
October 16, 2019 NO OBJECTION filed to #4 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. (dmn, )(no pdf)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that: 1. The plaintiff's challenge to the veracity of the evidence in his pending state criminal cases be summarily dismissed as this court must abstain from considering this challenge in accordance with the Younger abstention doctrine. 2. The plaintiff's slander/defamation claim brought under 42 U.S.C. 1983 be dismissed with prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). 3. The plaintiff's request for criminal prosecution of the defendants be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the directives of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). 4. The plaintiff's supplemental state tort claim of slander/defamation be dismissed without prejudice to any right the plaintiff may have to proceed on this claim before the state courts. 5. This case be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 10/8/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/24/2019. (kh, )
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Geneva County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/24/2019. (furn: cashier, account clerk)(kh, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Zachary G. Owens. (es, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Jimmy Hill, Kieth Shehee, Matthew G. Stevens, filed by Zachary G. Owens.(es, ) . Modified on 9/26/2019 to correct typos in the defts names for Kieth Shehee and Jimmy Hill (kh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Hill et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Shehee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kieth Shehee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary G. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?