Mason v. Ruskin Company
Plaintiff: Amanda Mason
Defendant: Ruskin Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00703
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bostick, Brian)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/20/2019; any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 11/20/2019, as further set out in order; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 10/23/2019. (cnw, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (def) Ruskin Company. (cnw, )
October 22, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #6 MOTION - Attorney Morgan Pike Epperson for Ruskin Company added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ruskin Company. (Bostick, Brian)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ruskin Company.(Bostick, Brian)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Compliant & #4 Summons signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Ruskin Company served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (cnw, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ruskin Company; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (cnw, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plf) Amanda Mason. (cnw, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Amanda Mason. (cnw, ) Modified on 9/25/2019 to correct filing date(cnw, ).
September 23, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Amanda Mason. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ruskin Company ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602054998), filed by Amanda Mason. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. Ruskin Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruskin Company
Represented By: Morgan Pike Epperson
Represented By: Brian Roberts Bostick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Mason
Represented By: Rachel Lee McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?