Pounders v. Parnell & Parnell, P.A.
Plaintiff: John Pounders
Defendant: Parnell & Parnell, P.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00834
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Andrew L Brasher
2 Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
3 Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
November 20, 2019 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as referral judge (NO PDF Document attached to this notice). (djy, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Pounders. Parnell & Parnell, P.A. served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/28/2019. (Panvini, Joseph)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING the #5 Motion for Joseph Panvini to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 11/7/2019. (am, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re: #5 Motion for Joseph Panvini : $75.00, receipt number 4602055571. (am, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Joseph Panvini to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Pounders. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Panvini, Joseph) Modified on 10/31/2019 to clarify text to include attorney's name (qc/djy, ).
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher. Chief Judge Emily C. Marks no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Parnell & Parnell, P.A. and returned to counsel for personal service. (am, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Conflict Disclosure Statement, filed by John Pounders. (am, )
October 29, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John Pounders. (NO PDF attached - See doc #1 ). (am, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Parnell & Parnell, P.A., filed by John Pounders. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602055471.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pounders v. Parnell & Parnell, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pounders
Represented By: Joseph Panvini
Represented By: Ruth Lang Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parnell & Parnell, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?