Rogers v. Howell et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Jacky Allen Rogers, Jr.
Defendant: Jeb Howell and Dothan Police Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00884
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE RECOMMENDING that: 1) Plaintiff's claims against the Dothan Police Department be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process under 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1); 2) The Dothan Police Department be TERMINATED as a party; and 3) This case be referred to the undersigned for additional proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/7/2020. (am, )
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before February 18, 2020; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named defendant Howell. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/6/2020. (kh, )
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Houston County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/6/2020. (furn: acct clerk, cashier) (kh, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jacky Allen Rogers, Jr. (amf, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Dothan Police Department, Jeb Howell, filed by Jacky Allen Rogers, Jr. (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Howell et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeb Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dothan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacky Allen Rogers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?