City of Headland, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Headland, Alabama
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Actavis, Inc., Actavis, PLS and Watson Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00886
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
2 Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Received email from OHND regarding receipt of e-transfer case; OHND case number assigned as 1:19-op-46131. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
December 10, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (No PDF attached to this entry) (wcl, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Unclaimed, Unable To Forward." Counsel is notified via this notice of unperfected service. (wcl, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by C. S. for Actavis, LLC served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (wcl, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by CT Corporation for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (wcl, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by C. S. for Cephalon, Inc. served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (wcl, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by Sammy Azer for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (wcl, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by CT Corporation for: Endo Health Solutions, Inc. served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Mallinckrodt LLC served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (wcl, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 18 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered on 12/5/2019 by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this action to USDC, Northern District of Ohio. (wcl, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by A. Verna for Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (wcl, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by Daniel D. Kelley for Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (wcl, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by Jennifer Lockwood for: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Noramco, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (wcl, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by Kelly Webster for: McKesson Corporation served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (wcl, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by Marilyn P. for Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (wcl, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by illegible for Johnson & Johnson served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (wcl, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, signed by Julie Buckner for TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (amf, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, signed by Julie Buckner for Actavis Pharma, Inc., served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (amf, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement. (bes, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Headland, Alabama. (wcl, )
November 15, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by City of Headland, Alabama. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #1 for PDF) (wcl, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602055706.), filed by City of Headland, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Headland, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, PLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Headland, Alabama
Represented By: Richard Douglas Stratton
Represented By: Jon Ryan Kral
Represented By: Rhon Eugene Jones
Represented By: William Robert Sutton
Represented By: Jeffrey Donald Price
Represented By: Jere Locke Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?