Jackson v. Saul (CONSENT)
Plaintiff: John L. Jackson
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00039
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge e-signed by counsel for Plf John L. Jackson. (amf, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge e-signed by counsel for Dft Andrew Saul. (amf, )
February 18, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #9 CONSENT - Attorney James Joseph DuBois for Andrew Saul added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #3 Order, signed by Emily Sase for U.S. Attorney General, served on 1/28/2020. (amf, )
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #3 Order, signed by Social Security Administration for Andrew Saul, served on 1/24/2020. (amf, )
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #3 Order, signed by Lawrence Beamon for U.S. Attorney's Office, served on 1/27/2020, answer due 4/26/2020 for Andrew Saul. (amf, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #3 Order, signed by Niarchos Wright for Social Security Office of Regional Counsel, served on 1/24/2020.(amf, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, & Social Security Office of Regional Counsel; mailed CMRRR with #1 Complaint & #3 Order.(amf, )
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; ORDER TO ANSWER Social Security Complaint within 90 days after the date of service of the complaint; plf to file brief in support within 40 days of filing of the answer; dft's reply brief and administrative record due within 30 days of brief filing; Copies mailed to counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/21/2020. (amf, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John L. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(imm, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by John L. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(imm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Saul (CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L. Jackson
Represented By: Walter Allen Blakeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?