Stephens v. Youngblood
Plaintiff: Berry Stephens
Defendant: Pauline Youngblood
Case Number: 1:2020cv00133
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Pauline Youngblood & returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (amf, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 REVISED REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Pauline Youngblood on 03/11/2020 by Berry Stephens. Waiver of Service due by 4/13/2020. (Wiggins, Raley) Modified on 3/11/2020 to reflect as a revised version of waiver (bes, ).
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Pauline Youngblood on 02/27/2020 by Berry Stephens. Waiver of Service due by 3/30/2020. (Wiggins, Raley)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Berry Stephens. (bes, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Berry Stephens. (bes, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pauline Youngblood ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602056946.), filed by Berry Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berry Stephens
Represented By: Raley Livingston Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pauline Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?