Thoms v. Advanced Technology Systems Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Laura Thoms
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada and Advanced Technology Systems Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00235
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Rule 26 Obligations and Discovery by Advanced Technology Systems Company, Inc., Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Riopka, Ashlee)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER directing plf to file a response to the defs' #21 and #23 MOTIONS to Dismiss and to Strike on or by 6/12/2020; the defs shall file a Reply on or by 6/22/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 6/2/2020. (NO PDF document attached to this notice).(djy, )
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Advanced Technology Systems Company, Inc.. (Christie, James)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of #21 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Collins, John) Modified on 5/29/2020 to clarify text to reflect as Memorandum of Law and remove excess text from entry (qc/djy, ).
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Collins, John). Added MOTION to Strike jury demand on 5/29/2020 as reflected in main PDF document (qc/djy, ).
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension for filing responsive pleading; the deadline is extended from 5/21/2020 to 5/28/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 5/20/20. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Riopka, Ashlee) Modified on 5/20/2020 to correct erroneous Motion event selected for docketing (qc/djy, ).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING as moot defs' Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Strike (docs #5 , #10 ), as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 5/15/2020. (djy, )
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Laura Thoms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Personal Representative Document, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Offer Letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Sun Life Enrollment Form, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Benefit Overview, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Benefit Summary, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - SunLife Insurance Letter to Client, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Doxley Letter re life ins, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Emails between ATSC and Sun Life regarding life insurance claim)(Talbott, Jeremiah)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Laura Thoms re #15 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Talbott, Jeremiah)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Laura Thoms; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr and Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams. Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred to Judge Adams, case reassigned #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Motion to Strike MOTION to Strike (djy, )
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James Sturgeon Christie, Jr on behalf of Advanced Technology Systems Company, Inc. (Christie, James)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James Sarven Williams on behalf of Advanced Technology Systems Company, Inc. (Williams, James)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Advanced Technology Systems Company, Inc.. (Christie, James)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JOINDER re #6 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Motion to Strike MOTION to Strike by Advanced Technology Systems Company, Inc.. (Williams, James)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JOINDER re #2 Notice of Removal, by Advanced Technology Systems Company, Inc.. (Christie, James)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the plf in writing as to why #5 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 5/11/2020; the def shall file a reply to the plf's response on or before 5/18/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/20/20. (djy, )
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 5/4/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/20/20. (djy, )
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Motion to Strike filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Group Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Group Policy Booklet)(Collins, John)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Motion to Strike by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Collins, John). Added MOTION to Strike jury demand as shown in main PDF document on 4/20/2020 (qc/djy, ).
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, Laura Thoms (djy, )
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Riopka, Ashlee)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to state court by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada re filing of #2 Notice of Removal. (djy, )
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada from Circuit Court of Dale County, Alabama, case number 26-CV-2020-900008. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602057548) (Attachments: #1 state complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 fee receipt)(djy, )
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order COMPLAINT against Advanced Technology Systems Company, Inc., Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada, filed by Laura Thoms. (NO PDF Document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #2 ).(djy, )
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Laura Thoms. (NO PDF Document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #2 ). (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thoms v. Advanced Technology Systems Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Represented By: John David Collins
Represented By: Ashlee Dee Riopka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Technology Systems Company, Inc.
Represented By: Ashlee Dee Riopka
Represented By: James Sarven Williams
Represented By: James Sturgeon Christie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Thoms
Represented By: Jeremiah J. Talbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?