Christopher v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Plaintiff: Debra S. Christopher
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00297
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2021, at 10:00 AM, in CR 2A, before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/6/2021; Jury Selection and Trial set for 7/12/2021, at 10:00 AM, in Dothan, Alabama, before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks; Dispositive and Daubert due by 1/13/2021; Mediation Notice due by 12/19/2020; Amended Pleadings due by 8/14/2020. Discovery due by 12/14/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 6/15/2020. (furn: calendar, ws)(kh, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (DeLashmet, Wilbur)
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as referral Judge. Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cwl, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Debra S. Christopher. (kh, )
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than June 10, 2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 5/20/2020. (kh, )
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that the parties should now make their selection in writing to consent or request reassignment. The parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before May 28, 2020. Note: CONSENT FORMS MAY NOW BE SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 5/14/2020. (kh, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Debra S. Christopher, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (kh, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (DeLashmet, Wilbur)
May 1, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
May 1, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Debra S. Christopher. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
May 1, 2020 COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., filed by Debra S. Christopher.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. from Circuit Court of Houston County, AL, case number 38-CV-2020-900046.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602057805) (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Deft's Answer to State Court Complaint, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: Mignon Mestayer DeLashmet
Represented By: Wilbur Pemble DeLashmet
Represented By: Chad Christopher Marchand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra S. Christopher
Represented By: Jonathan Wesley Cooner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?