Andrews v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Donald Andrews
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 1:2020cv00312
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 Third MOTION to Extend Defendant's Answer Deadline by Donald Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Miles) Modified on 7/6/2020 to clarify docket text as reflected in pleading (am, ).
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: GRANTING the #8 Motion to Extend Defendant's Answer Deadline; Defendant shall file an answer on or before 7/3/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/23/2020. (am, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Defendant's Answer Deadline by Donald Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Miles) Modified on 6/23/2020 to clarify text as reflected in pleading (am, ).
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Dft's Answer Deadline; Dft shall file an answer on or before 6/19/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/9/2020. (wcl, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Defendant's Answer Deadline by Donald Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Williams, Miles) Modified on 6/5/2020 to clarify text as reflected in pleading(am, ).
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Kelly Webster for Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (am, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (wcl, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Donald Andrews. (am, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Donald Andrews. (am, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, filed by Donald Andrews (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602057842.). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Andrews
Represented By: Miles Clayborn Williams
Represented By: David Paul Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?