Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. v. SJW, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Steve Wyrosdick, SJW, L.L.C. and Jamie Wyrosdick
Case Number: 1:2020cv00405
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (defendants) SJW, L.L.C., Jamie Wyrosdick, Steve Wyrosdick. (djy, )
July 13, 2020 ***Attorney Thomas A Blackstock, Jr for SJW, L.L.C. added pursuant to #8 answer (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Jamie Wyrosdick, Steve Wyrosdick.(Blackstock, Thomas) Modified on 7/14/2020 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of SJW, LLC (qc/djy, ).
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.; Jamie Wyrosdick served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Sefton, Patrick)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.; Steve Wyrosdick served on 6/20/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Sefton, Patrick)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.; SJW, L.L.C. served on 6/20/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Sefton, Patrick)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SJW, L.L.C., Jamie Wyrosdick, Steve Wyrosdick and returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (bes, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. (djy, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. (djy, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SJW, L.L.C., Jamie Wyrosdick, Steve Wyrosdick ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602058237.), filed by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. v. SJW, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Wyrosdick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SJW, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Wyrosdick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Ladd Wheeler Sefton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?