Shelley et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Michael W. Shelley and Hudson T. Shelley
Defendant: Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00505
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
2 Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:1501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate. Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as referral judge (No PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Charles Woodhouse, II Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 8/6/2020. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for Charles Woodhouse, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602058822.) by Hudson T. Shelley, Michael W. Shelley. (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by Emily Sase on 7/27/2020 for Attorney General of the US. (djy, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by Jordan Johnson for US Attorney; answer due 9/22/2020 for Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America.(djy, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by Coy USDA for Farm Service Agency served on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (djy, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney's Office, Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture, & U.S. Attorney General; mailed by CMRRR with copy of #1 Petition. (amf, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hudson T. Shelley. (amf, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Michael W. Shelley. (amf, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF ADMINISTRATIVE ACTION, AND HEARING DE NOVO against United States of America, Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602058598), filed by Michael W. Shelley, Hudson T. Shelley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Filing Fee Receipt) (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelley et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Service Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Shelley
Represented By: George L. Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Charles F. Woodhouse, II
Represented By: Nancy Linn Eady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudson T. Shelley
Represented By: George L. Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Charles F. Woodhouse, II
Represented By: Nancy Linn Eady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?