Eubanks v. Deere & Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joni Harper Eubanks
Defendant: Deere & Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01077
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (wcl, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate as referral judge; Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (wcl, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Carpenter, Reid)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 26 (f) ORDER: DIRECTING that the parties confer and submit a report based on the trial terms and scheduling order requirements of the Middle District of Alabama on or before 2/22/2021, as further set out in Order; further DIRECTING Counsel for the parties to complete the appropriate attached form and send it to the Clerk of the Court by 2/22/2021, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 2/1/2021. (am, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Deere & Company, Inc. (am, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Reid Clark Carpenter on behalf of Deere & Company, Inc. (Carpenter, Reid)
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Deere & Company, Inc.. (Hall, Amber)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Deere & Company, Inc..(Hall, Amber)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, conflict statement and complaint signed by (illegible) for Deere & Company, Inc. served on 1/7/2021, answer due 1/28/2021. (djy, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Deere & Company, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Disclosure Statement. (wcl, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Joni Harper Eubanks. (am, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joni Harper Eubanks. (am, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deere & Company, Inc., filed by Joni Harper Eubanks. (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number 4602060739.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(am, )
December 30, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joni Harper Eubanks. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eubanks v. Deere & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Amber Nicole Hall
Represented By: Reid Clark Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joni Harper Eubanks
Represented By: Stephen Mark Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?