United States of America v. Bolen et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ivory Minnette Bolen
Garnishee: Publix
Case Number: 1:2020mc03912
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Writ of Garnishment by United States of America. (DuBois, James)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Publix. (am, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 PROCESS RECEIPT & RETURN EXECUTED by US Marshals as to #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, #3 Writ Issued, & #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, Ivory M. Bolen served on 4/30/2020. (am, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 WRIT of GARNISHMENT issued and furnished to USMS for service. (kh, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (am, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2020: #1 Corrected Front Page) (wcl, ). Modified on 4/24/2020 to attach a corrected front page to reflect the correct dft name (wcl, ).
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Instructions to Garnishee, #2 Notice of Garnishment, #3 Right to Claim Exemption, #4 Proposed Writ, #5 Answer of Garnishee Form)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bolen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Publix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivory Minnette Bolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?