Gulf South Communications, Inc. et al v. WOOF Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gulf South Communications, Inc., Bryan Holladay and Clay Holladay
Defendant: WOOF Inc. and Bryant Corbitt
Case Number: 1:2021cv00040
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2510
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 17 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as referral Judge. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cwl, )
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: it is ORDERED that plfs shall respond, separately and severally, to each def's motions, on or before 3/17/2021. The defs may file replies on or before 3/24/2021, as further set out in order. It is further ORDERED that the motions to dismiss the original complaint (Docs. #2 , #7 ) are DENIED as MOOT. Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 3/8/2021, as further set out in order. Do NOT electronically file the reassignment form nor consent form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/5/2021. (cwl, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTS I, II, V, VI, AND VIII - XII OF #8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Bryant Corbitt. (Nichols, William) Modified on 2/22/2021 to add link (cwl, ).
February 19, 2021 Filing 14 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, V, VI, VIII-XII, and XIV of First Amended Complaint filed by WOOF Inc.. (Essig, Brandon)
February 19, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, V, VI, VIII-XII, and XIV of #8 First Amended Complaint by WOOF Inc.. (Essig, Brandon) Modified on 2/19/2021 to add link (cwl, ).
February 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Error re #11 Order, which was entered in the wrong civil action and is hereby STRICKEN from the record.(amf, )
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (STRICKEN, ENTERED IN WRONG CIVIL ACTION) ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) By 2/22/2021, Plaintiff shall submit an inmate account statement from the inmate account clerk at the Montgomery County Detention Facility; 2) The Clerk of Court SEND a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Montgomery County Detention Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 2/8/2021. (Copy mailed to account clerk as directed)(amf, ) Modified on 2/8/2021 (amf, ). (Main Document 11 replaced on 2/8/2021) (amf, ).
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bryan Holladay, Clay Holladay. (Maughan, Diane)
February 5, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Gulf South Communications, Inc.. (Maughan, Diane)
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bryant Corbitt, WOOF Inc., filed by Clay Holladay, Gulf South Communications, Inc., Bryan Holladay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Maughan, Diane)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Bryant Corbitt. (Nichols, William)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bryant Corbitt. (Nichols, William)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES. (amf, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by WOOF Inc.. (amf, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by WOOF Inc.. (amf, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I-II and V-XIV of Complaint by WOOF Inc.. (amf, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WOOF Inc. from Circuit Court of Houston County, AL, case number 38-CV-2020-900551.00. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 4602060952) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Defendant Corbitt's Consent to Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )
January 15, 2021 COMPLAINT against Bryant Corbitt, WOOF Inc., filed by Clay Holladay, Gulf South Communications, Inc., Bryan Holladay. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF)(amf, )
January 15, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gulf South Communications, Inc., Bryan Holladay, Clay Holladay. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF) (amf, )
January 15, 2021 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Bryant Corbitt re #1 Notice of Removal. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 3 for PDF)(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulf South Communications, Inc. et al v. WOOF Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOOF Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Wesley Smithart
Represented By: Brandon Essig
Represented By: Daniel Foster Johnson
Represented By: M. Wesley Smithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Corbitt
Represented By: William Wayne Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulf South Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: Harry Preston Hall, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Holladay
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: Harry Preston Hall, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clay Holladay
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: Harry Preston Hall, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?