Kestra Investment Services, LLC v. Chancey
Plaintiff: Kestra Investment Services, LLC
Defendant: Terry Chancey
Case Number: 1:2021cv00397
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before 7/30/2021, the Plf shall file the appropriate documentation to effectuate the dismissal of this case; further ORDERED that all pending deadlines in the case are hereby CONTINUED generally, pending dismissal. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 7/1/2021. (wcl, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & Complaint signed by Terry Chancy, received by B. Key CV19 for Terry Chancey served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (am, )
June 7, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Kestra Investment Services, LLC. (Wright, Mickey)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Terry Chancey and mailed CMRRR w/ copy of #1 Complaint. (am, )
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Kestra Investment Services, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample)(am, )
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Enjoin FINRA Arbitration Filed Filed by Terry Chancey, filed by Kestra Investment Services, LLC. (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number 4602063519.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Receipt)(am, )
June 3, 2021 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Kestra Investment Services, LLC. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kestra Investment Services, LLC v. Chancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kestra Investment Services, LLC
Represented By: Colin Thomas Dean
Represented By: Mickey Bryan Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Chancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?