Freeman-Newsome v. Wild Subs Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Amyah Freeman-Newsome
Defendant: Wild Subs Incorporated, Karen Rodiguez and Karen Rodriguez
Case Number: 1:2021cv00489
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 38 U.S.C. ยง 4311
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STANDARD BRIEFING ORDER, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 9/7/2021. (djy, )
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: setting Pretrial Conference for 10/13/2022 @ 1:30 PM before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker Jr., in Courtroom 2D, the FMJ US Courthouse, Montgomery, AL; directing the parties to jointly prepare a proposed pretrial order on or before 10/6/2022, as further set out in order;. Jury Trial set for 12/12/2022 @ 10:00 AM before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker Jr., in Dothan, Alabama; Amended Pleadings due by 11/23/2021; Discovery completed by 3/16/2022; dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 4/15/2022; Mediation Notice due by 3/16/2022, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 9/7/2021. Furnished to calendar group & DH.(djy, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan by Wild Subs Incorporated. (Ott, Ann)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULE 26(f) ORDER: It is ORDERED that the FRCP 26(f) Report containing the proposed discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than 9/23/2021 as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/23/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 8/31/2021. (dmn, )
August 31, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Correction re #16 Case Reassigned to correct erroneous main PDF document correcting typographical error (Attachments: #1 correct main document to Docket entry #16 )(djy, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 16 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr and Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams. Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, ) (Main Document 16 replaced on 8/31/2021 to correct erroneous main PDF document correcting typographical error) (qc/djy, ).
August 23, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wild Subs Incorporated. (Ott, Ann)
August 23, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Karen Rodriguez. (Ott, Ann)
August 17, 2021 ***Attorney Margaret Amelia Mitta added for Karen Rodriguez and Wild Subs Incorporated. (dmn, ) (see Doc. #13 for pdf)
August 17, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to 9 Amended Complaint, by Karen Rodriguez, Wild Subs Incorporated.(Ott, Ann)
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amyah Freeman-Newsome. Wild Subs Incorporated served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (Jarrard, Thomas)
July 30, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amyah Freeman-Newsome. Karen Rodriguez served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (Jarrard, Thomas)
July 23, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Karen Rodriguez, Wild Subs Incorporated. Service materials returned to counsel as requested for personal service. (dmn, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED/CORRECTED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, DAMAGES, AND JURY TRIAL FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE UNIFORMED SERVICES EMPLOYMENT AND REEMPLOYMENT ACT ("USERRA") with JURY DEMAND against Wild Subs Incorporated, Karen Rodriguez, filed by Amyah Freeman-Newsome.(dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #6 for pdf; wrong civil event code selected when originally filed) (dmn, )
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion and Proposed Order for Leave to Proceed as a Veteran Without Filing Fee filed on 7/19/2021. (Doc. No. #2 .) It is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED pursuant to 38 U.S.C. 4323(h)(1), Enforcement of Rights with Respect to a State or Private Employer, "no fees or court costs may be charged or taxed against any person claiming rights under this chapter." The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to issue a summons for service upon the defendants in this case. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 7/23/2021. (dmn, )
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Upon consideration of the #3 Motion for Entry of Order Admitting Thomas G. Jarrard to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Doc. No. #3 ) filed on 7/19/2021, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 7/23/2021. (dmn, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 [PLEASE DISREGARD THIS DOCKET ENTRY. WRONG CIVIL EVENT SELECTED WHEN ORIGINALLY FILED. SEE CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY.] MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, Correcting caption and spelling of Defendant's name by Amyah Freeman-Newsome. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Personal Service Summons for Clerk's Signature)(Jarrard, Thomas) Modified on 7/23/2021 (dmn, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/23/2021) Modified on 7/23/2021 attachment filed in wrong format. (dmn, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/23/2021 due to (2) two defendant names included on one summons.) (dmn, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Amyah Freeman-Newsome. (Jarrard, Thomas)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Amyah Freeman-Newsome. (dmn, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for Entry of Order Admitting Thomas G. Jarrard to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 75.00, Receipt No. 4602064021.) by Amyah Freeman-Newsome. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed as a Veteran Without Filing Fee by Amyah Freeman-Newsome. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Leave to Proceed as Veteran Without Filing Fee)(dmn, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, DAMAGES, AND JURY TRIAL FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE UNIFORMED SERVICES EMPLOYMENT AND REEMPLOYMENT RIGHTS ACT ("USERRA") against Karen Rodiguez, Wild Subs Incorporated, filed by Amyah Freeman-Newsome. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn, )
July 19, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Amyah Freeman-Newsome. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #1 )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman-Newsome v. Wild Subs Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amyah Freeman-Newsome
Represented By: Thomas G. Jarrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wild Subs Incorporated
Represented By: Ann Ashton Holmes Ott
Represented By: Margaret Amelia Mitta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Rodiguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Rodriguez
Represented By: Ann Ashton Holmes Ott
Represented By: Margaret Amelia Mitta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?