United States of America v. McCoy
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Elizabeth McCoy
Case Number: 1:2021cv00498
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Elizabeth McCoy. Corporate Disclosures due by 9/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 PRO SE ANSWER (Motion) to #1 Complaint by Elizabeth McCoy.(cwl, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Elizabeth McCoy for Elizabeth McCoy, served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (amf, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Elizabeth McCoy; mailed by CMRRR with #1 Complaint. (amf, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Powell, Kari)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plaintiff United States of America; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elizabeth McCoy, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kari Powell
Represented By: Samantha R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?