Maldonado v. Town of Cottonwood et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Maldonado
Defendant: Town of Cottonwood, Tony Money and Jim L. Smith
Case Number: 1:2021cv00645
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 14 Evidentiary Submission Notice of filing exhibits in opposition to #3 motion to dismiss filed by Jennifer Maldonado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Not guilty verdict, #2 Exhibit Not guilty verdict)(Griffin, Ricky) Modified on 11/10/2021 to clarify text to reflect as NOTICE of filing exhibits (qc/djy, ).
October 29, 2021 Filing 13 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as referral judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (bes, )
October 29, 2021 Motions No Longer Referred: #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Tony Money, Jim L. Smith, Town of Cottonwood. (Pike, James)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: it is ORDERED that dfts may file a reply on or before 10/27/2021; Directing counsel for the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 11/2/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/22/2021. (hfc, )
October 19, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jennifer Maldonado. (Griffin, Ricky)
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition #3 motion to dismiss filed by Jennifer Maldonado. (Griffin, Ricky) Modified on 10/22/2021 to clarify text to reflect as in opposition to #3 motion to dismiss (qc/djy, ).
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jennifer Maldonado. (Griffin, Ricky)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Tony Money, Jim L. Smith, Town of Cottonwood re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #4 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of Filings Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, Excerpts from 38-CC-2019-002949.00, #2 Ex. 2, Excerpts from 38-CC-2019-002950.00)(Pike, James)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Jennifer Maldonado; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (all parties) Jennifer Maldonado, Tony Money, Jim L. Smith, Town of Cottonwood. (djy, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support of #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Tony Money, Jim L. Smith, Town of Cottonwood. (djy, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Tony Money, Jim L. Smith, Town of Cottonwood. (djy, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tony Money, Jim L. Smith, Town of Cottonwood. (djy, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tony Money, Jim L. Smith, Town of Cottonwood from Circuit Court of Houston County, AL, case number 38-CV-2021-900344.00. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064788) (Attachments: #1 state court complaint, #2 state court record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 fee receipt)(djy, )
September 28, 2021 COMPLAINT against Tony Money, Jim L. Smith, Town of Cottonwood, filed by Jennifer Maldonado. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ).(djy, )
September 28, 2021 NOTICE to state court by Tony Money, Jim L. Smith, Town of Cottonwood re filing of #1 Notice of Removal (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
September 28, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jennifer Maldonado. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldonado v. Town of Cottonwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Maldonado
Represented By: John G. Scherf, IV
Represented By: Ricky Edison Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Cottonwood
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Represented By: Preston Young Register
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Money
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Represented By: Preston Young Register
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim L. Smith
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Represented By: Preston Young Register
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?