Perez v. Kijakazi (CONSENT)
Plaintiff: Pamela Perez
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv00666
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw for Attorney Nadine Elder. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 11/12/2021. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
November 12, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE 15 TEXT ORDER - Attorney Nadine Deluca Elder terminated. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
November 11, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw #13 Notice of Correction for Nadine Elder by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Choi, Sarah)
November 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Correction re #11 Notice of Appearance, to attach a corrected PDFdocument to reflect appearance made for Attorney Elder and not Attorney Choi. (Attachments: #1 Corrected main document to doc entry #11 )(bes, )
November 5, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #12 NOTICE - Attorney Sarah Elizabeth Choi for Kilolo Kijakazi added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
November 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Choi on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Choi, Sarah) (Main Document 12 replaced on 11/8/2021 to remove ability to edit PDF) (bes, ). Modified on 11/8/2021 to correct filer as Kijakazi and not ATL SSAOGC (bes, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2021: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (bes, ).
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Deluca Elder on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Elder, Nadine) (Main Document 11 replaced on 11/8/2021 to remove ability to edit PDF) (bes, ). Modified on 11/8/2021 (bes, ). (Main Document 11 replaced on 11/9/2021 to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect appearance made for Attorney Elder and not Attorney Choi) (bes, ). Modified on 11/9/2021 (bes, ).
October 28, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge e-signed by Counsel for (PLF) Pamela Perez. (bes, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge e-signed by Counsel for (DFT) Kilolo Kijakazi. (bes, )
October 28, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #9 CONSENT - Attorney James Joseph DuBois for Kilolo Kijakazi added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #3 Order signed by illegible for the Attorney General of the United States, served on 10/20/2021. (bes, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #3 Order returned unsigned for Kilolo Kijakazi, served on 10/18/2021. (bes, )
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #3 Order signed by Sophia B. for the US Attorney's Office served on 10/14/2021, answer due 1/12/2022. (bes, )
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of the summons, #1 Complaint, and #3 Order signed by Niarchos Wright for the Social Security Administration, served on 10/15/2021. (bes, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney, Social Security Office of Regional Counsel, and U.S. Attorney General; mailed CMRRR with a copy of the #1 Complaint and #3 Order. (bes, )
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDER TO ANSWER Social Security Complaint within 90 days after the date of service of the complaint; plaintiff to file brief in support within 40 days of filing of the answer; dft's reply brief and administrative record due within 30 days of brief filing. Copies mailed to counsel; To consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, you may complete the attached form and return it to the Clerk within 21 days from the date of this order; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor the reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 10/12/2021. (bes, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pamela Perez. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(hrs, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Pamela Perez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hrs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Kijakazi (CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Perez
Represented By: Hannah Grace Lindsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Choi
Represented By: Nadine Deluca Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?