United Service Automobile Association v. M1 Support Services, LP et al
Plaintiff: United States Automobile Association and United Service Automobile Association
Defendant: M1 Support Services, LP and Danny Floyd Payne
Case Number: 1:2021cv00676
Filed: October 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Consolidate by M1 Support Services, LP, Danny Floyd Payne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Motion to Consolidate)(Smithart, M.) Modified on 11/10/2021 to clarify the docket text (bes, ).
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as presiding judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case. (bes, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DFTs) M1 Support Services, LP, Danny Floyd Payne. (bes, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Timothy Speegle on behalf of M1 Support Services, LP, Danny Floyd Payne (Speegle, Clinton)
November 9, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by M1 Support Services, LP. (Smithart, M.)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Danny Floyd Payne. (Smithart, M.)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with jury demand by M1 Support Services, LP, Danny Floyd Payne.(Smithart, M.)
November 9, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 ANSWER - Attorney Rachel McCulley Lary and Clinton Timothy Speegle for M1 Support Services, LP and Danny Floyd Payne added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United Service Automobile Association re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement . (Azar, Zack) Modified on 11/4/2021 to add the link to the #3 Notice(bes, ).
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by illegible for M1 Support Services, LP and Danny Floyd Payne served on (no date provided), answer due 11/12/2021. (bes, )
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to M1 Support Services, LP, Danny Floyd Payne; mailed CMRRR with a copy of the #1 Complaint. (bes, )
October 15, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to United Service Automobile Association; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) United Service Automobile Association. (bes, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M1 Support Services, LP, Danny Floyd Payne ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064914.), filed by United Service Automobile Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Service Automobile Association v. M1 Support Services, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Automobile Association
Represented By: Zack Michael Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Service Automobile Association
Represented By: Zack Michael Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M1 Support Services, LP
Represented By: Clinton Timothy Speegle
Represented By: Rachel McCulley Lary
Represented By: M. Wesley Smithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Floyd Payne
Represented By: Clinton Timothy Speegle
Represented By: Rachel McCulley Lary
Represented By: M. Wesley Smithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?