Jones v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Khristi Jones
Defendant: United States of America, Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture and Tom Vilsack
Case Number: 1:2021cv00744
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 14 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Patrice Pettus for Tom Vilsack on 11/29/2021. (cwl, )
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #11 ), it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant may file a responsive pleading on or before March 14, 2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 12/21/2021. (NO pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DEFS) Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America, Tom Vilsack. (cwl, )
December 20, 2021 ***PURSUANT TO THE #10 CDS - Attorney Marylou E. Bowdre for Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America, Tom Vilsack added. (NO pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America, Tom Vilsack. (DuBois, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2021: #1 Corrected Signature page & Certificate of Service) (cwl, ).
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America, Tom Vilsack. (Bowdre, Marylou)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 Return Receipt Cards showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Summons signed by Lawrence B. for U. S. Attorney's Office served on 11/12/2021, answer from Farm Service Agency & Tom Vilsack due 1/11/2022. (cwl, )
November 12, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: United States Department of Agriculture & United States of America Answers due 1/9/2022. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Charity Glover for United States Department of Agriculture served on 11/10/2021. (hfc, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Elizabeth G. Anderson for United States of America served on 11/10/2021. (hfc, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Tom Vilsack; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (cwl, )
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement to clarify as satisfying #3 deficiency notice by Khristi Jones. (McGowan, Stephen) Modified on 11/8/2021 (cwl, ). (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/8/2021 to replace fillable form with a protected PDF) (cwl, ).
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America, Tom Vilsack, ALL C/O U.S. Attorney; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (cwl, )
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Khristi Jones. Corporate Disclosures due by 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Khristi Jones. (cwl, )
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW, HEARING DE NOVO, AND EQUITABLE RELIEF against Farm Service Agency, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America, Tom Vilsack ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602065133.), filed by Khristi Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 receipt)(cwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khristi Jones
Represented By: Stephen Glenn McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Represented By: Marylou E. Bowdre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Service Agency
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Represented By: Marylou E. Bowdre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Represented By: Marylou E. Bowdre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Represented By: Marylou E. Bowdre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?