Kalenian et al v. Cook
Plaintiff: Yalena Kalenian and Mark Kalenian
Defendant: Howard Russell Cook
Case Number: 1:2021cv00812
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: it is ORDERED that on or before 2/16/2022, the parties shall show cause for why they should not be sanctioned for failing to abide by this Courts #10 order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 2/2/2022. (es, )
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the FRCP 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than 1/4/2022, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/4/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 12/14/2021. (es, )
December 9, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00382. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, GRANTING #6 Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 12/9/2021. (mab) [Transferred from alsd on 12/9/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Plaintiffs are ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE by October 25, 2021, why Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue (Doc. #6 ) should not be granted and this matter transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Alabama. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/12/2021. (mab) [Transferred from alsd on 12/9/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer filed by Howard Russell Cook. (Whitt, Murry) [Transferred from alsd on 12/9/2021.]
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 10/5/2021. (Attachment: #1 consent form) (mab) [Transferred from alsd on 12/9/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Howard Russell Cook (Milling, Bert) [Transferred from alsd on 12/9/2021.]
September 3, 2021 COMPLAINT against Howard Russell Cook, filed by Yalena Kalenian, Mark Kalenian. (NO PDF document attached-See docket entry #1 ).(djy, )
September 3, 2021 NOTICE to state court by Howard Russell Cook re filing of #1 Notice of Removal (NO PDF Document attached to this notice-See docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Howard Russell Cook. (Holtsford, Alex) [Transferred from alsd on 12/9/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Howard Russell Cook. (Holtsford, Alex) [Transferred from alsd on 12/9/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2867735, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Howard Russell Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court case file, #2 Exhibit Declarations page) (Holtsford, Alex) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2021: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (mab). [Transferred from alsd on 12/9/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalenian et al v. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yalena Kalenian
Represented By: Cory Holley Driggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Kalenian
Represented By: Cory Holley Driggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Russell Cook
Represented By: Alex Lafayette Holtsford, Jr.
Represented By: Murry Scott Whitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?