McGuire v. Tomanelli (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Isaiah McGuire
Defendant: Michael Tomanelli
Case Number: 1:2022cv00412
Filed: July 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Order of the Court entered on this day adopting the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, Final Judgment is entered in favor of Dft and against Plf, and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice; DIRECTING The Clerk of the Court to enter this document on the civil docket as a Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(es, )
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: ADOPTING #5 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge; this case is DISMISSED with prejudice; Final Judgment will be entered separately. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/17/2022. (es, )
August 16, 2022 No Objections received re #5 Recommendation. (No PDF attached to this entry) (es, )
July 25, 2022 Filing 5 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: the Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS the following: 1) Plf's #3 Motion to Amend Sworn Affidavit be GRANTED; 2) Plf's #1 Complaint be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 3) This case be CLOSED; Objections to R&R due by 8/8/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 7/25/2022. (es, ) Modified on 7/25/2022 (es, ).
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Dale County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 7/20/2022. (Furn: cashier) (es, )
July 12, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Request Permission to Amend Sworn Affidavit of Plaintiff In Support of Civil Action by Isaiah McGuire. (hrs, )
July 12, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Isaiah McGuire. (hrs, )
July 12, 2022 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Michael Tomanelli, filed by Isaiah McGuire. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Affidavit)(hrs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGuire v. Tomanelli (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Tomanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?