Stoddart v. Dodson (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Quantavious Stoddart
Defendant: Investigator Dodson
Case Number: 1:2022cv00490
Filed: August 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 10/24/2022, Plaintiff must file a prison account statement from the inmate account clerk, as further set out in order; the Clerk is DIRECTED to provide a copy of this Order to the inmate account clerk at the facility where Plaintiff is detained. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 10/3/2022. (order mailed to acct clerk at KCF)(cwl, )
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave Requesting Permission to Amend by Quantavious Stoddart. (cwl, )
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Quantavious Stoddart. (cwl, )
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: the Clerk is DIRECTED to return the IFP application (Doc. #2 ) to Plaintiff and retain a copy for the Court file. It is ORDERED that by 9/6/2022, Plaintiff must sign the IFP application and refile it with the Court, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 8/22/2022. (doc #2 mailed to plf/copy in file, as directed)(cwl, )
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Quantavious Stoddart. (hrs, )
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Investigator Dodson, filed by Quantavious Stoddart.(hrs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoddart v. Dodson (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quantavious Stoddart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investigator Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?