Walker v. Crespi et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Neil Walker
Defendant: Michael Crespi, Frances H. Smith, Jeff Sessions, Sue Bell Cobb, William Richard Moeglin and Bryan Blackwell
Case Number: 1:2022cv00515
Filed: August 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2022 Filing 11 USCA Order as to In Re: Neil Walker, Application for Leave to File a Second or Successive Habeas Corpus Petition, 28 U.S.C. 2244(b) re Appeal No. 22-13302-A. Motion for leave to file successive petition for habeas corpus filed by Petitioner Neil Walker is DENIED. (dmn, )
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Extension of Time, and the deadline for Petitioner to file objections to the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation is extended to 10/28/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 10/7/2022. (wcl, )
October 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE by Neil Walker. (am, )
September 27, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by by Neil Walker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(am, )
September 12, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by Neil Walker. (am, )
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: It is ORDERED that Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/7/2022. (cwl, )
September 7, 2022 Filing 5 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: It is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that the #1 2254 petition be DISMISSED under 28 U.S.C. 2244(b)(3)(A) for lack of jurisdiction as a successive petition filed without the required preauthorization from the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals; Objections to R&R due by 9/21/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/7/2022. (am, )
September 6, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Intervention by Neil Walker. (am, )
September 6, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Injunctive Release by Neil Walker. (am, )
August 26, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Neil Walker. (bll, )
August 26, 2022 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Bryan Blackwell, Sue Bell Cobb, Michael Crespi, William Richard Moeglin, Jeff Sessions, Frances H. Smith, filed by Neil Walker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(bll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/2/2022: #11 Original Signature Page) (am, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Crespi et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Crespi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Bell Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Richard Moeglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?