Currington v. Juneau et al (INMATE 4)
Plaintiff: DeAndre D. Currington
Defendant: Commander Juneau, Deputy Chief Bryan and Dustin R. Folk
Case Number: 1:2022cv00518
Filed: August 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Chad W Bryan
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2022 Filing 9 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice; It is the further RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that Plaintiff's #8 motion to amend be DENIED AS MOOT; On or before 11/10/2022, the parties may file written objections to this Recommendation. Signed by Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan on 10/27/2022. (es, )
October 20, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION Requesting Permission for Leave to Amend to Civil Action by DeAndre D. Currington. (wcl, )
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that the #6 motion be GRANTED and that Plaintiff be informed of the status; it is hereby further ORDERED that, no later than 10/19/2022, Plaintiff must submit an inmate account statement reflecting the average monthly balance and the average monthly deposits to his account for the 6-month period; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to provide a copy of this Order to the inmate account clerk at the facility where Plaintiff is incarcerated, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan on 10/5/2022. (Mailed as directed to plf & Limestone CF acct clerk) (es, )
October 3, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Status filed by DeAndre D. Currington. (amf, )
October 3, 2022 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by DeAndre D. Currington. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #6 for PDF)(amf, )
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that, no later than 9/30/2022, Plaintiff must submit an inmate account statement, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to provide a copy of this Order to the inmate account clerk at the facility where Plaintiff is incarcerated. Signed by Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan on 9/16/2022. (Mailed copy as directed)(es, )
September 15, 2022 Filing 4 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by DeAndre D. Currington. (amf, )
September 14, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Submit Inmate Account Statement filed by DeAndre D. Currington. (Attachments: #1 ADOC Transaction Report)(amf, )
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that, no later than 9/15/2022, Plaintiff must either remit the $402.00 filing and administrative fees or file a properly supported motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; DIRECTING the Clerk to furnish a copy of the form affidavit used by persons seeking to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan on 9/1/2022. (IFP form mailed as directed)(amf, )
August 31, 2022 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Deputy Chief Bryan, Dustin R. Folk, Commander Juneau, filed by DeAndre D. Currington. (NO IFP; NO FILING FEE)(hrs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Currington v. Juneau et al (INMATE 4)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeAndre D. Currington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commander Juneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Chief Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin R. Folk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?