Home Oil Company, Inc. v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Home Oil Company, Inc. an Alabama corporation doing business as Hobo Pantry Food Stores #2, 6, 10, 20 and 32
Defendant: United States of America, by and through the United States Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 1:2024cv00821
Filed: December 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41. Signed by Trey Granger, Clerk of Court, on 2/11/2025. (AM)
February 10, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Home Oil Company, Inc. (Mooty, Harold)
December 19, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America, by and through the United States Department of Agriculture, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General, United States Attorney's Office/Civil-Process Clerk, and U.S. Department of Agriculture; NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service and serve with a copy of the Complaint. (GGN)
December 19, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Form to Decline Consent to the U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Home Oil Company, Inc., d/b/a Hobo Pantry Food Stores #2, 6, 10, 20 and 32. Declination of Consent to Magistrate Judge due by 1/9/2025. (Attachments: #1 General Order)(GGN)
December 19, 2024 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen Michael Doyle, as presiding judge. (GGN)
December 18, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Home Oil Company, Inc., d/b/a Hobo Pantry Food Stores #2, 6, 10, 20 and 32. (Mooty, Harold)
December 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, by and through the United States Department of Agriculture ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AALMDC-3764127.), filed by Home Oil Company, Inc., d/b/a Hobo Pantry Food Stores #2, 6, 10, 20 and 32. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 3/18/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons - Kevin P. Davidson, Acting United States Attorney, #3 Proposed Summons - US Attorney's Office/Civil - Process Clerk, #4 Proposed Summons - Merrick B. Garland, US Attorney General, #5 Proposed Summons - Amie Churchill - United States Department of Agriculture) (Mooty, Harold) Modified on 12/19/2024 to clarify text (GGN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home Oil Company, Inc. v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, by and through the United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Oil Company, Inc. an Alabama corporation doing business as Hobo Pantry Food Stores #2, 6, 10, 20 and 32
Represented By: Harold Dean Mooty, Jr
Represented By: Robert Styles Mooty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?