Crum, et al v. State of Alabama, et al

Plaintiff: Eugene Crum, Jr., Robert L. Smith and Ellen Tolbert
Defendant: State of Alabama, State of Alabama Department of Education, Alabama Department of Corrections, Morris L. Thigpen, State of Alabama Personnel Board and Department, Don Siegelman, Joe N. Dickson, Harry McMillan, John McMillan, J. Ray Warren, Hazel Johnston Lee, James K. Lyons, Riley Boykin Smith, Melissa Mauser Galvin, Ed Richardson, Jim McCamy, James Hayes, Jr. and Jackie Graham
Intervenor_plaintiff: Rodney Huntley, Ethelene Duster, Samuel L. Price, Carol Banks, David Barley, Betty Crum, Katherine Matthews, Wanda Jackson Speights, Theodore Jones, Lewis Gilchrist, Terry Dale Goodson, Carolyn A. Ball, David Said, Herman Powell, Earl Vaughn, Nonie Williams, Darrell Wright, Gladys Jones, Roosevelt Mays, Jr., Eddie G. McCoy, Deborah F. Lumpkin, Romanza A. Hamilton, Jacquelyn J. Jackson-Kelly, Mable G. Elliott, Jerome F. Dangerfield, John Bradford, Kenneth Rodgers, Thornton Taylor, Robert E. Moore, John W. Winston, Donald B. Chatman and Mary Golthy
Intervenor_defendant: State of Alabama Emergency Management Agency, Alabama Alcoholic Beverage Control Board, Department of Industrial Relations, Alabama Department of Economic and Community Affairs, Alabama Industrial Development Training Agency, Alabama Bureau of Tourism and Travel, Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Education, Alabama Department of Revenue, Department of Public Health, Alabama Development Office, Attorney General's Office, Retirement System of Alabama, Alabama State Board of Registrars, Department of Human Resources, Department of Mental Health, Alabama Medicaid Agency, Alabama Board of Public Accounting, Alabama Commission on Physical Fitness, Alabama Labor Board, Alabama State Docks Department, State of Alabama Personnel Department, John E. Nagle, Ann Bryon Abram and Harris L. Cornett
Cross_defendant: State of Alabama Personnel Board and Department, State of Alabama Emergency Management Agency, Paulette Williams and Jackie Graham
Movant: Kenneth Rodgers, Maggie L. Gresham, Charlye Mae Pines, Alabama Department of Public Safety, Martin Gutmann, Sheila Russell, Robert Taylor, Laneeta Roberts, Velma Easterling, Kitty Williams-Archie, Sylvia Adams, McMillion, Roy Hightower, Gail Howard, Charles Wilson, Wilson Morgan, Laura Johnson, Diane Green, Dorothy Carson and Alabama State Employees Association
Cross_claimant: George Grabryan
Case Number: 2:1994cv00356
Filed: March 24, 1994
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2016 945 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 692 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied as moot. The motion seeks summary judgment against intervenor plaintiff Charles C. Chinakwe, whose 353 Motion to Intervene was converted into a separate civil action, see 793 Order, and w ho was terminated as a party to this action on 5/18/2007. It is further ORDERED that the related 724 Motion to have said motion for summary judgment considered along with another motion for summary judgment is denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/14/2016. (dmn, )
March 11, 2016 944 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: It having come to the courts attention that plaintiff Carolyn Ball was not served with the submission order on the motion to dismiss her case forfailure to prosecute, it is ORDERED that the submission order (doc. no. 935 ) is vacated. It is f urther ORDERED that plaintiff Carolyn Ball must SHOW CAUSE, if any there be, in writing by 3/25/2016, as to why the motion to dismiss her case (doc. no. 932 ) should not be granted. If plaintiff Ball does not respond by that date, her case will be dismissed. Show Cause Response due by 3/25/2016. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/11/2016. Copy mailed regular mail and CMRRR to Carolyn A. Ball.(dmn, )
December 2, 2013 915 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 913 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jackie Graham, State of Alabama, State of Alabama Personnel Board and Department, State of Alabama Personnel Department. Motion Submission Deadline set for 1/3/2014without oral argument with any opposition brief and evidentiary materials due by 12/20/2013, and any reply to the opposition due by 1/3/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/2/2013. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crum, et al v. State of Alabama, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Crum, Jr.
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Henry Wallace Blizzard, III
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Susan Gale Donahue
Represented By: Amelia Haines Griffith
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Robert Lee Wiggins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Smith
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Henry Wallace Blizzard, III
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Thomas T. Gallion, III
Represented By: Amelia Haines Griffith
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Robert Lee Wiggins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Tolbert
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Henry Wallace Blizzard, III
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Amelia Haines Griffith
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Represented By: Robert Lee Wiggins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Rodney Huntley
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Ethelene Duster
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Samuel L. Price
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Carol Banks
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Richard Joe Ebbinghouse
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: David Barley
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Betty Crum
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Katherine Matthews
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Wanda Jackson Speights
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Theodore Jones
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Lewis Gilchrist
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Terry Dale Goodson
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Carolyn A. Ball
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: David Said
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Herman Powell
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Earl Vaughn
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Nonie Williams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Darrell Wright
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Gladys Jones
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Roosevelt Mays, Jr.
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Eddie G. McCoy
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Deborah F. Lumpkin
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Romanza A. Hamilton
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Jacquelyn J. Jackson-Kelly
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Mable G. Elliott
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Jerome F. Dangerfield
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: John Bradford
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Kenneth Rodgers
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Thornton Taylor
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Robert E. Moore
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: John W. Winston
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Donald B. Chatman
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Mary Golthy
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Ann K. Wiggins
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Represented By: Margaret Lindsey Fleming
Represented By: Henry Lewis Gillis
Represented By: Willie Julius Huntley, Jr.
Represented By: Mai Lan Fogal Isler
Represented By: Brandy Murphy Lee
Represented By: Frank DeCalve Marsh
Represented By: John Joseph Park, Jr.
Represented By: William H. Pryor, Jr.
Represented By: William H. Pryor, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Andrew Weldon Redd
Represented By: Charles Wallace Reed, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Jackson Russell, Sr.
Represented By: Christopher William Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama Department of Education
Represented By: David R. Boyd
Represented By: Larry Eugene Craven
Represented By: Juliana Faria Teixeira Dean
Represented By: Jimmie Robert Ippolito, Jr.
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Represented By: John Barksdale Holmes, III
Represented By: Warren Bricken Lightfoot, Jr.
Represented By: David Michael Smith
Represented By: Kim Tobias Thomas
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris L. Thigpen
Represented By: Andrew Weldon Redd
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama Personnel Board and Department
Represented By: Alice Ann Byrne
Represented By: Keith S. Miller
Represented By: Patrick Hanlon Sims
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christopher William Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Siegelman
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Represented By: Aaron Linden Dettling
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe N. Dickson
Represented By: Richard Taylor Abbot, Jr.
Represented By: Alice Ann Byrne
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry McMillan
Represented By: Richard Taylor Abbot, Jr.
Represented By: Alice Ann Byrne
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McMillan
Represented By: Richard Taylor Abbot, Jr.
Represented By: Alice Ann Byrne
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ray Warren
Represented By: Richard Taylor Abbot, Jr.
Represented By: Alice Ann Byrne
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazel Johnston Lee
Represented By: Richard Taylor Abbot, Jr.
Represented By: Alice Ann Byrne
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James K. Lyons
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christopher William Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Boykin Smith
Represented By: David Johnson Dean
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christopher William Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Mauser Galvin
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christopher William Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Richardson
Represented By: Larry Eugene Craven
Represented By: Aaron Linden Dettling
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim McCamy
Represented By: Warren Bricken Lightfoot, Jr.
Represented By: David Michael Smith
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hayes, Jr.
Represented By: Willie Julius Huntley, Jr.
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Graham
Represented By: Richard Taylor Abbot, Jr.
Represented By: Alice Ann Byrne
Represented By: Keith S. Miller
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: State of Alabama Emergency Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Alabama Alcoholic Beverage Control Board
Represented By: John Barksdale Holmes, III
Represented By: Warren Bricken Lightfoot, Jr.
Represented By: David Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Department of Industrial Relations
Represented By: David R. Boyd
Represented By: John James Coleman, III
Represented By: Aaron Linden Dettling
Represented By: Frank DeCalve Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Alabama Department of Economic and Community Affairs
Represented By: Edward Earl Davis
Represented By: Willie Julius Huntley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Alabama Industrial Development Training Agency
Represented By: Willie Julius Huntley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Alabama Bureau of Tourism and Travel
Represented By: Willie Julius Huntley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries
Represented By: David R. Boyd
Represented By: John James Coleman, III
Represented By: Aaron Linden Dettling
Represented By: Robert Jackson Russell, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Alabama Department of Education
Represented By: John James Coleman, III
Represented By: Larry Eugene Craven
Represented By: Aaron Linden Dettling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Alabama Department of Revenue
Represented By: Ronald James Bowden
Represented By: David R. Boyd
Represented By: John James Coleman, III
Represented By: Aaron Linden Dettling
Represented By: Gwendolyn Bulger Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Department of Public Health
Represented By: Carol Robin Gerard
Represented By: Ashley H. Hamlett
Represented By: John Barksdale Holmes, III
Represented By: Warren Bricken Lightfoot, Jr.
Represented By: David Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Alabama Development Office
Represented By: Willie Julius Huntley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Attorney General's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Retirement System of Alabama
Represented By: Richard Taylor Abbot, Jr.
Represented By: William Franklin Kelley, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher William Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Alabama State Board of Registrars
Represented By: David R. Boyd
Represented By: John James Coleman, III
Represented By: Aaron Linden Dettling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Department of Human Resources
Represented By: Roger Lee Bates
Represented By: Sharon E. Ficquette
Represented By: John Barksdale Holmes, III
Represented By: Warren Bricken Lightfoot, Jr.
Represented By: David Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Department of Mental Health
Represented By: Roger Lee Bates
Represented By: John Barksdale Holmes, III
Represented By: Warren Bricken Lightfoot, Jr.
Represented By: David Michael Smith
Represented By: Courtney Wayne Tarver
Represented By: Mark Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Alabama Medicaid Agency
Represented By: William O. Butler, III
Represented By: Tammy R. Hudson-Adams
Represented By: Mai Lan Fogal Isler
Represented By: Barbara Jean Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Alabama Board of Public Accounting
Represented By: William H. Pryor, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Robert Douglas Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Alabama Commission on Physical Fitness
Represented By: David R. Boyd
Represented By: John James Coleman, III
Represented By: Aaron Linden Dettling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Alabama Labor Board
Represented By: Richard Taylor Abbot, Jr.
Represented By: Angela C. Turner
Represented By: Christopher William Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Alabama State Docks Department
Represented By: Mai Lan Fogal Isler
Represented By: Christopher William Weller
Represented By: Barbara Jean Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: State of Alabama Personnel Department
Represented By: Keith S. Miller
Represented By: Barbara Jean Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: John E. Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Ann Bryon Abram
Represented By: Aaron Linden Dettling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Harris L. Cornett
Represented By: Aaron Linden Dettling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: State of Alabama Personnel Board and Department
Represented By: Keith S. Miller
Represented By: Patrick Hanlon Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: State of Alabama Emergency Management Agency
Represented By: John Barksdale Holmes, III
Represented By: Warren Bricken Lightfoot, Jr.
Represented By: David Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Paulette Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Jackie Graham
Represented By: Richard Taylor Abbot, Jr.
Represented By: Alice Ann Byrne
Represented By: Keith S. Miller
Represented By: Wendy Tyler Tunstill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Kenneth Rodgers
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Fletcher Childs, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Maggie L. Gresham
Represented By: Lee David Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Charlye Mae Pines
Represented By: Lee David Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Alabama Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Martin Gutmann
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: James William Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Sheila Russell
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Alan H Garber
Represented By: Scott A. Gilliland
Represented By: Kimberly C. Page
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Robert Taylor
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Alan H Garber
Represented By: Scott A. Gilliland
Represented By: Kimberly C. Page
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Laneeta Roberts
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Alan H Garber
Represented By: Scott A. Gilliland
Represented By: Kimberly C. Page
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Velma Easterling
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Alan H Garber
Represented By: Scott A. Gilliland
Represented By: Kimberly C. Page
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Kitty Williams-Archie
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Alan H Garber
Represented By: Scott A. Gilliland
Represented By: Kimberly C. Page
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Sylvia Adams
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Alan H Garber
Represented By: Scott A. Gilliland
Represented By: Kimberly C. Page
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: McMillion
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Alan H Garber
Represented By: Scott A. Gilliland
Represented By: Kimberly C. Page
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Roy Hightower
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Alan H Garber
Represented By: Scott A. Gilliland
Represented By: Kimberly C. Page
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Gail Howard
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Alan H Garber
Represented By: Scott A. Gilliland
Represented By: Kimberly C. Page
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Charles Wilson
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Alan H Garber
Represented By: Scott A. Gilliland
Represented By: Kimberly C. Page
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Wilson Morgan
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Alan H Garber
Represented By: Scott A. Gilliland
Represented By: Kimberly C. Page
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Laura Johnson
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Scott A. Gilliland
Represented By: Kimberly C. Page
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Diane Green
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Alan H Garber
Represented By: Scott A. Gilliland
Represented By: Kimberly C. Page
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Dorothy Carson
Represented By: Russell Wayne Adams
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Alan H Garber
Represented By: Scott A. Gilliland
Represented By: Kimberly C. Page
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Alabama State Employees Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: George Grabryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?