Johnson v. Albright et al (INMATE1)
Case Number: 2:2006cv00546
Filed: June 20, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDERED that 28 Magistrate Judge's Recommendation is ADOPTED; (2) Defendants' 16 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; (3) Costs are TAXED against the plaintiff; and (4) this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 11/20/2009. (cb, )
June 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that: (1) The claims arising from actions which occurred on or before June 18, 2004 be dismissed with prejudice; (2) Plaintiff's claims against Kim Tobias Thomas be dismissed with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(I); (3)Kim J. Thomas be dismissed as a defendant in this cause of action; (4) This case, with respect to the plaintiff's claims against defendants Albright, Wheeler, Allen and Mason, be referred back to the undersigned for appropriate proceedings. On or before July 12, 2006 the parties may file objections to this Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 7/12/2006. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/29/2006. (cb, )
June 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 3 MOTION for preliminary injunction be denied; this case be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings; Parties may file objections to the Recommendation on or before 7/5/06. Objections to R&R due by 7/5/2006. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/26/2006. (cb, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Albright et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?