Green v. Elmore County Jail et al (INMATE2)

Case Number: 2:2006cv00667
Filed: July 26, 2006
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2008 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that: (1) the 16 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; (2) This case is due to be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 4997e(c)(1); and (3) The costs of this proceeding are TAXED against Plaintiff Green for which execution may issue. An appropriate judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 10/29/2008. (cb, )
October 6, 2008 70 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that: (1) Defendant Roberts' 16 motion for summary judgment, as supplemented be GRANTED; (2) Judgment be ENTERED in favor of Defendant Roberts and against Plaintiff; and (3) The costs of this proceeding be TAXED against Plaintiff for which execution may issue. Objections to R&R due by 10/19/2008. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/6/2008. (cb, )
July 28, 2006 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that (1) The plaintiff's claims against the Elmore County Jail and his challenge to the lack of a timely response to his inmate grievance be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B )(i); (2) The Elmore County Jail be dismissed as a defendant in this cause of action; (3)This case, with respect to the plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants, be referred back to the undersigned for appropriate proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 8/11/2006. Signed by Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson on 7/28/2006. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Elmore County Jail et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?