Cooper v. Carter et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: David Cooper
Defendant: M.D. Hall, Luice McLemore, District Attorney Office of Montgomery County, Anthony Todd Carter and Clerk of Montgomery District Court
Case Number: 2:2007cv00011
Filed: January 3, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 Notice of Appeal filed by David Cooper, that plaintiff is required to pay the requisite $455.00 fee for filing this notice of appeal as further set out in the order. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/17/2008. Copy mailed to Madison Correctional Facility as directed; furnished to Intake. (dmn)
January 18, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by David Cooper, that: 1. Plaintiff's complaint against the named defendants be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 191 5(e)(2)(B); 2. Plaintiff's unlawful confinement claim be DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); 3. This complaint be DISMISSED prior to service of process. Objections to R&R due by 1/30/2007. Signed by Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/18/2007. (dmn)
January 12, 2007 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Montgomery County Detention Facility. Signed by Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/12/07. Furnished to cashier. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Carter et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luice McLemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Attorney Office of Montgomery County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Todd Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of Montgomery District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?