Allen v. Lowndes County Sheriff Dept. et al (INMATE2)
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Allen
Defendant: Lairue Gresham, Jeanette Cottrell, Kiki Lawson and Lenny Lee
Case Number: 2:2007cv00090
Filed: January 31, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Lowndes
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ADOPTING 50 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. Defendants' 28 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted to the extent defendants seek dismissal due to plaintiff's failure to exhaust available administrative remedies. Ordered that plaintiff's complaint is dismissed as further set out in order. An appropriate judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 3/26/09. (sl, )
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) defendants' 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment be granted to the extent defendants seek dismissal of this case for plaintiff's failure to exhaust available adminisstrative remedies; (2) this case be dismissed with prejudice as further set out in order. Objections to R&R due by 3/12/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 2/27/09. (sl, )
February 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) plaintiff's claims against the Lowndes County Sheriff's Department be dismissed with prejudice prior to service; (2) the Lowndes County Sheriff's Department be dismissed as a party to this complaint; (3) this case with respect to the remaining defendants be referred back to the Magistrate Judge. Objections to R&R due by 2/14/2007. Signed by Judge Wallace Capel Jr. on 2/2/07. (sl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Lowndes County Sheriff Dept. et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lairue Gresham
Represented By: Daryl L. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette Cottrell
Represented By: Daryl L. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiki Lawson
Represented By: Daryl L. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenny Lee
Represented By: Daryl L. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?