Kreidler v. Smith et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Jeffery Lynn Kreidler
Defendant: Willie Thomas
Case Number: 2:2007cv00263
Filed: March 27, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting Warden Willie Thomas's 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment; taxing costs of this proceeding against Plaintiff Jeffery Lynn Kreidler for which let execution issue. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 10/29/2009. (cc, )
October 8, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Jeffery Lynn Kreidler that: 1. Defendant Thomas' MOTION for Summary Judgment be GRANTED. 2. Judgment be GRANTED in favor of defendant Thomas. 3. This case be dismissed with prejudice. 4. The costs of this proceeding be taxed against the plaintiff. Objections to R&R due by 10/21/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 10/8/2009. (dmn)
March 28, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Elmore CF. Signed by Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/28/2007. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kreidler v. Smith et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Lynn Kreidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Thomas
Represented By: Jack W. Wallace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?