Owens et al v. State of Alabama Department of Mental Health and Mental Retardation et al

Plaintiff: Joan Faulk Owens and Karen Lynn Hubbard
Defendant: Marilyn Benson, John Houston, Otha Dillihay, Henry R. Ervin and State of Alabama Department of Mental Health and Mental Retardation
Case Number: 2:2007cv00650
Filed: July 17, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2008 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the defendants' Objections in Doc. #'s 111 114 115 116 117 and 118 are SUSTAINED in part and OVERRULED in part as set out in this order. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 10/24/08. (sl, )
October 23, 2008 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: (1) defendants' 113 Motion in Limine is granted in part and denied in part as further set out in order; (2) the defendants' 12 Objections to plaintiffs' Exhibit List are sustained as further set out in order; (3 ) the remaining objections will be ruled on at trial, in light of the evidence, if and when, the exhibits are offered and an objection is made. The court will rule by separate Order on objections to evidence regarding Dr. Lindsey and Dr. Kumar. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 10/23/08. (sl, )
October 22, 2008 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendants' 100 MOTION in Limine Regarding Policies, Procedures, Rules and Regulations is GRANTED only to the extent that the Plaintiffs may not refer to evidence of ADMH policies and procedures in opening statement, and must take u p the evidence outside of the presence of the jury before introducing it; that defendants' 101 MOTION in Limine regarding membership in organizations is GRANTED to the extent that the Plaintiffs may not introduce evidence of Dillihay's as sociations with various groups, unless the Defendants open the door to that evidence; that defendants' 104 MOTION in Limine regarding the EEOC File is DENIED as to Plaintiff's Exhibit 158, and the Motion in Limine is GRANTED in all other respects; that plaintiff's 108 MOTION in Limine regarding testimony of Emmett Poundstone is DENIED to the extent that Poundstone is testifying to things within his own personal knowledge, rather than giving an interpretation of laws or practic es, and GRANTED in all other respects; that plaintiffs' 109 MOTION in Limine is GRANTED to the extent that the Defendants are not to refer to exhibits involving the Segal Group study and report, or to Exhibit 104, in any way without first taki ng it up outside of the presence of the jury; that defendants' 110 MOTION in Limine regarding Dillihay's deposition is DENIED as moot; that the remaining 113 MOTION in Limine of the Defendants will be addressed in a separate Order. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 10/22/2008. (cc, )
October 16, 2008 130 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: (1) the plaintiffs' 92 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Pretrial Contentions is granted in part and denied in part as further set out in order; (2) the defendants' 93 Motion to Amend/Correct to Add Defenses and to Reinstate a Defense to their Pretrial Contentions is granted in part and denied in part as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 10/16/08. (sl, )
October 15, 2008 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: (1) the defendants' request to be able to file rebuttal designations to plaintiffs' deposition designations, contained within document 98 is granted; (2) the defendants' 111 114 115 116 117 118 objecti ons to plaintiffs' deposition designations are overruled to the extent that they raise objections based on the complete deposition answer not being designated by the plaintiffs; (3) the plaintiffs need only respond to the defendants' objections to deposition designations by the court's deadline of 10/20/08 to the extent the defendants object on grounds other than that the entire answer was not designated. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 10/15/08. (sl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens et al v. State of Alabama Department of Mental Health and Mental Retardation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otha Dillihay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry R. Ervin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama Department of Mental Health and Mental Retardation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Faulk Owens
Represented By: James Flynn Mozingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Lynn Hubbard
Represented By: James Flynn Mozingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?