Miles v. Montgomery City Police Department et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Louis E. Miles, Jr.
Defendant: Montgomery City Police Department, Officer Dickey, Bobby Bright, Art Baylor and M. McCord
Case Number: 2:2007cv00950
Filed: October 23, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the Court that the court's findings of fact and conclusions of law entered in open court on 2/8/11 are amended in the following two respects: (1) the sentence on lines 2-3 on page 3, is amended t o read "Dickey gave Miles the following warning three times: 'Police officer. Speak now or I am going to release my dog.'"; (2) the sentence on lines 16-17 on page 4, is amended to read "In other words, that the use of force maliciously and sadistically to cause harm is unconstitutional is clearly established by law."; ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that judgment is entered in favor of def W.B. Dickey and against plf Louis E. Miles, Jr., with plf Miles taki ng nothing by his complaint; further ORDERING that costs are taxed against plf Miles, for which execution may issue; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; this case is closed. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 2/10/11. (Attachments: # 1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )
August 26, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 8/26/2010. (br, )
August 10, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 8/10/2010. (wcl, )
October 29, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 3 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at the Perry County Correctional Center. Signed by Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/29/07. (sl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. Montgomery City Police Department et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis E. Miles, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Baylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?