Brown v. Longmire et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Eugene Brown, Sr.
Defendant: COI Longmire, CO I Giles, Captain Boyd, Capt Browning, Leon Forniss, B. Mitchum and R. Allen
Case Number: 2:2008cv00781
Filed: September 22, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Limestone
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling plaintiff's 25 Objection; adopting 22 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge; dismissing this case without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to pay the full filing fee upon the initiation of this case. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 3/5/2009. (cc, )
November 18, 2008 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 11/18/08. (djy, )
October 21, 2008 6 Opinion or Order of the Court [WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO 21 ORDER FILED ON 1/12/09] ORDERED that on or before 11/12/08 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of court the sum of $12.83 as an initial partial filing fee as further set out in order. The Clerk is directed to furnish a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Limestone Correctional Facility; granting 2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 10/21/08. (sl, ) Modified on 1/12/2009 (sl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Longmire et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Brown, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COI Longmire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO I Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Forniss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Mitchum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?