Tatum v. Marshall et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Jeremy Christopher Tatum
Defendant: D. T. Marshall, Johnny Hardwick, Eleanor I. Brooks, Larry Sasser, Melissa Rittenour and Ms. Wright
Case Number: 2:2008cv00792
Filed: September 25, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. For the reasons stated in the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation, Plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. 1983 claims against Defendants Johnny Hardwick, Melissa Rittenour, Eleanor Brooks, and Larry Sasser are DI SMISSED with prejudice and prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), (ii) and (iii). Plaintiff's 1983 claims against Defendant Marshall regarding the constitutionality of his confinement are DISMISSED as Defendant Marshall has acted pursuant to the directives of a state court in ensuring Plaintiff's confinement. Plaintiff's challenge to the constitutionality of the conviction and sentence imposed upon him by the Circuit Court of Montgome ry County, Alabama, for assault is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) because such claims are not properly before the Court at this time. This case, with respect to Plaintiff's claims challengin g the handling of his personal mail and overcrowded conditions at the Montgomery County Detention Facility lodged against Defendants Marshall and Wright, is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 1/28/2009. (dmn)
January 6, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Jeremy Christopher Tatum that: 1. The plaintiff's claims against Johnny Hardwick, Melissa Rittenout, Eleanor Brooks, and Larry Sasser be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), (ii), and (iii). 2. The plaintiff's claims against defendant Marshall regarding the constitutionality of his confinement based on the indictment and subsequent conviction be summarily dismissed as Marshall acted pursuant to directives of a state court when ensuring such confinement. 3. The plaintiff's challenge to the constitutionality of the conviction and sentence imposed upon him by the Circuit Court of Montgo mery County, Alabama for assault be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) as such claims are not properly before the court at this time. 4. This case, with respect to the plaintiff's claims challen ging the handling of his personal mail and overcrowded conditions at the Montgomery County Detention Facility lodged against defendants Marshall and Wright, be referred back to the undersigned for further appropriate proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 1/19/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/6/2009. (dmn)
October 14, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Montgomery County Detention Facility. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr. on 10/14/2008. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tatum v. Marshall et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Christopher Tatum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Hardwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleanor I. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Rittenour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?