The State of Alabama v. Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services et al

Plaintiff: The State of Alabama
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Herb B. Kuhn, Kerry1 N. Weems, Michael O. Leavitt and Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 2:2008cv00881
Filed: November 3, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT, n accordance with the prior orders of the Court it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED as follows: (1) judgment is entered in favor of the plaintiff, the State of Alabama and against the defendants; (2) costs are hereby TAXED against the defendan ts, and in favor of Alabama, for which execution may issue; (3) directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket sheet as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and close this file. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/18/11. (Attachments: # 1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )
February 14, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the final Pretrial Conference scheduled in this case for February 25, 2011, trial scheduled for March 21, 2011, and all deadlines contained in this Court's 41 Uniform Scheduling Order associated with the trial are CANCELLED. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/14/11. (Furnished to Calendar and KG.)(scn, )
August 20, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the Michigan Department of Community Health's 48 Motion and Brief to Intervene as Amicus Curiae is GRANTED, as further set out. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 8/20/10. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The State of Alabama v. Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Alabama
Represented By: James F. Segroves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herb B. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry1 N. Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?