Himmelberger v. Davis et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Mark Himmelberger
Defendant: Officer Davis and Nurse Nulls
Case Number: 2:2009cv00043
Filed: January 21, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Bullock
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER adopting 27 Report and Recommendations; that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 6/22/2009. (cc, )
May 22, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this case be dismissed without prejudice; Objections to R&R due by 6/4/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 5/22/2009. (cc, )
January 23, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Bullock County CF. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 1/23/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Himmelberger v. Davis et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Himmelberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Nulls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?