Burns v. Boyd et al (INMATE 2)

Case Number: 2:2009cv00100
Filed: February 5, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT that, upon consideration of prior proceedings, opinions and orders entered in this case, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that judgment be and is hereby ENTERED in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff, and that this action is DISMISSED w ith prejudice as moot; the Clerk is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure . Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 1/25/11. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(scn, )
February 20, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's claims against Commissioner Allen be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that Commissioner Allen be DISMISSED as a part y to this complaint; that this case with respect to the remaining defendant be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 2/20/2009. (cc, ) Copies mailed to plaintiff, defendant Allen, AG for State of Alabama and General Counsel for ADOC. Modified on 2/23/2009 to reflect that the deadline for filing any objections is set for 03/03/2009 (cc, ).
February 9, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 2/9/09. Furnished to cashier. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Boyd et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?