Thomas v. Montgomery City Jail et al (INMATE2)

Case Number: 2:2009cv00293
Filed: April 7, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice; Objections to R&R due by 8/25/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 8/12/2009. (cc, )
April 14, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's claims against the Montgomery City Jail be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that the Montgomery City Jail be DISMISSED as a party to this complaint; that this case with respect to the remaining defendants be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 4/27/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 4/14/2009. (cc, )
April 9, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Lowndes County Detention Facility. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 4/9/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Montgomery City Jail et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?